Board of Governors |
First Appointed |
Term Expires |
2002 Voting FOMC Member |
2003 Voting FOMC Member |
2004 Voting FOMC Member |
Alan Greenspan * Chairman |
Aug 11, 1987 |
Jan 31, 2006
Jun 20, 2004 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Roger W. Ferguson, Jr. Vice Chairman |
Nov 5, 1997 Oct 5, 1999 |
Jan 31, 2000 Oct 5, 2003 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Edward M. Gramlich |
Nov 5, 1997 |
Jan 31, 2008 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Edward W. Kelley, Jr. announced retirement |
May 26, 1987 |
Jan 31, 2004 |
no |
no |
no |
Laurence H. Meyer |
Jun 20, 1996 |
Jan 31, 2002 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Susan Schmidt Bies |
Dec. 7, 2001 |
Jan 31, 2012 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
Mark Olson |
Dec. 7, 2001 |
Jan 31, 2010 |
yes |
yes |
yes |
|
Federal Reserve Bank Presidents |
First Appointed |
Term Expires |
2001 Voting FOMC Member |
2002 Voting FOMC Member |
2003 Voting FOMC Member |
Cathy E. Minehan, Boston |
Jul 13, 1994 |
|
|
|
yes |
William J. McDonough, New York** |
Jul 19,1993 |
|
yes |
yes |
yes |
Anthony Santomero, Philadelphia |
July 10, 2000 |
|
yes |
|
|
Jerry L. Jordan, Cleveland |
Mar 9, 1992 |
|
yes |
|
yes |
J. Alfred Broaddus Jr., Richmond |
Jan 1, 1993 |
|
|
yes |
|
Jack Guynn, Atlanta |
Jan 1, 1996 |
|
|
yes |
|
Michael H. Moskow, Chicago |
Sep 1, 1994 |
|
|
yes |
|
William Poole, St. Louis |
Mar 23, 1998 |
|
|
|
yes |
Gary H. Stern, Minneapolis |
Mar 16, 1985 |
|
yes |
|
|
Thomas M. Hoenig, Kanas City |
Oct 1, 1991 |
|
|
|
yes |
Robert D. McTeer, Jr., Dallas |
Feb 1, 1991 |
|
yes |
|
|
Robert T. Parry, San Francisco |
Feb 4, 1986 |
|
|
yes |
|
* Chairman, Federal Open Market Committee
** Vice Chairman, Federal Open Market Committee
|